Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jose Adrian Coreas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gastman, Gregory, Gorayeb, Christopher J., Turco, Jared Arthur, Vargas, Christopher Lee, against 345 Management Group Inc., 50 Tun Trust, All State 12 Gc Corp., represented by Rothman, Robert Alexander, Sweetbaum, Joel A., in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Paul A. Goetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul A. Goetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2020STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Consent to Change Attorney |
||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C All State 12 GC Corp. answer to amended complaint |
||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B 50 Tun Trust and 345 Management Group Inc answer to amended complaint |
||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Bill of Particulars |
||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Amended Summons and Complaint |
||
May 23, 2023 | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | ||
May 16, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
May 01, 2023 | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT | ||
December 09, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney for Defts. 50 Tun Trust & 345 Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.