Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company As Subrogee Of S R Rozbruch And Yonina Jacobs, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hilsenrath, Steven I, Konzelmann, Christopher, against Mnyc Real Estate Holdings Llc, Stephen Pagot, represented by Fitzgerald, Lisa Marie, Holas, Sean Martin, Hughes, Daniel Thomas, Salvato, Richard Anthony, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Post Deposition Notice to Produce |
||
November 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 07, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation Consolidating Actions |
||
October 01, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Consolidation Order |
||
September 28, 2021 | Notice of Entry with Order | ||
July 01, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation |
||
June 25, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Discovery |
||
June 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A |
||
June 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.