Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
George Owens, Pranpattie Owens, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mayer, David H, against Genting New York Llc, Resorts World Casino, Tutor Perini Corporation, represented by Rabus, Michael J, Reda, Stephanie Nicole, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Debra A James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra A James Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1049 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: June 25, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: July 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005) | |
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) | |
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
December 09, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #005) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
December 09, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
December 09, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
November 20, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #005) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
November 20, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
November 20, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 59EFM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #005) IAS MOTION 59EFM 9:00AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.