Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Evan Griminger, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Schirmer, Richard Eugene, against 28Th Highline Associates, L.L.C., 28Th Highline Associates, L.L.C. C O The Related Companies, 28Th Lending Company, L.L.C. C O Jeffrey A. Levitt, 311 10Th Avenue Associates, Llc C O The Related Companies, L.P., 505-507 West 27Th Street Limited Partnership C O Central Iron & Metal Co., (total of 9) See All represented by Bernstein, Robert Louis, Cipollina, Danielle Loren, Counsel, Corporation, Erenburg, Aram Lee, Garvey, Patrick James, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lyle E Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLyle E Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time713 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding settlement |
|
February 26, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM SETTLED Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 52 2PM W/COMPL CONF;RM106 Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.