Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
William Grey , On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Sachar, Roger Alan, against Lic Development Owner, L.P., represented by Brett, Matthew Samuel, Dutka, Aris Edward Lynn, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene P. Bluth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Real Estate Class Action) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 09, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Kong Lease |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) DHCR Rent History |
||
March 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) First Lease |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Renewal Lease |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Streeteasy Advertisement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.