Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adela Hervert Sanchez , Widow Of Meliton Velasco Lopez, Deceased And On Behalf Of Her Son J.S.V.H.; A Minor;, Alejandro Porcayo Bedolla , Individually;, Alfonso Guillermo Lopez Arellano , Individually;, Benito Alvarado Nieva , Individually;, Bernarda Salgado Lopez As Parent Of Deceased Daughter Nanci Lezama Salgado And On Behalf Of Minor Daughter T.L.S., (total of 13) See All filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Sheehan, Patrick, Webster, Jason C., against Alstom Mexicana, Alstom Transportation Inc., Caf Usa, Inc., Carso Infraestructura Y Construccion, Ingenieros Civiles Asociados, (total of 5) See All represented by Braude, Daniel M, Horst, Nathan Taylor, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Lori S. Sattler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori S. Sattler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Train Crash) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Adela Hervert Sanchez , Widow Of Meliton Velasco Lopez, Deceased And On Behalf Of Her Son J.S.V.H.; A Minor;
Bernarda Salgado Lopez As Parent Of Deceased Daughter Nanci Lezama Salgado And On Behalf Of Minor Daughter T.L.S.
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 08, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 24, 2022 | LETTER ROGATORY - ( REQUEST FOR SIGNATURE ) | ||
June 08, 2022 | LETTER ROGATORY - ( REQUEST FOR SIGNATURE ) | ||
June 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
June 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 19, 2022 |
STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #001) Stipulation of Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss |
||
May 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.