Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Govind R. Vaghashia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gelhaar, Ned Morrison, against Nidhi Vaghashia, represented by Lovelace, Othiamba Nkosi, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlexander M. Tisch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PETITION
Date: January 13, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter dated Feb 16 |
||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001) Aff of Respondents employer in Opp to OSC |
||
March 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter dated Feb 28 |
||
February 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) George Aff with exhibits |
||
January 31, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Aff of Lovelace with Exhibit |
||
January 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
January 31, 2022 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.