Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Michael Knopf, Norma Knopf, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Berry, Eric, Greenberg, Gary H, against Dorsey & Whitney, Llp, Edward S. Feldman, Frank M. Esposito, Michael Hayden Sanford, Nathaniel H. Akerman, (total of 6) See All represented by Akerman, Nathaniel H., Badaracco, Anthony Peter, Drooyan, Katherine Janna, Esposito, Frank Michael, Feldman, Edward S, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Gerald Lebovits presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Lebovits Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fraud;Judiciary L. 487) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint by the Knopfs is against multiple attorneys and one non-attorney, Michael Sanford, for various torts arising out of litigation involving the couple's efforts to obtain a loan made to Pursuit Capital Management, LLC, and secured by a mo...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 22, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 13, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 13, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 13, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 22, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 20, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 18, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 13, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 10, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: May 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 20, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 10, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 15, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 11, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 20, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 24, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 24, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 16, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 230
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: April 22, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: April 22, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 04, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 22, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: April 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 10, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 04, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 01, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2021APPENDIX Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 04, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 04, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: February 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 30, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 30, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 18, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 02, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 02, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 18, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #008)
Date: August 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #009) *Corrected*
Date: August 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: November 28, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 13, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 06, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #009)
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: November 13, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: October 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: September 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: September 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #015)
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 11, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 350
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 25, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 08, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #016)
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #016)
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #016)
Date: August 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #016) *Corrected*
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #016)
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #016)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 09, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: July 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #016)
Date: October 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #014)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 06, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 02, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: March 07, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: March 02, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of document subpoena on Michael Sanford
Date: February 23, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 25, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: February 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: February 02, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: February 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: January 11, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 28, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 28, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 25, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 01, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #008)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 14, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #014)
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #010)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #014)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: October 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: October 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 27, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78 Â (Motion #019) Payments to Sanford from the closing of PHC
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: May 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #013)
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #016)
Date: August 11, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #016)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #016)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 28, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 24, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 24, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 129 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #019) *Corrected*
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 128 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 132 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 127 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 123 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 117 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 146 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 143 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 145 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 147 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 139 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 142 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 136 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 134 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 20, 2023STIPULATION - VENUE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 18, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 10, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #019)
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116 Â (Motion #019)
Date: April 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 151 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 135 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 144 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #019)
Date: August 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 153 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 28, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 150 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 149 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 156 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 152 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 155 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 157 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 154 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 148 Â (Motion #019)
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #019) 1st Dept. ruling in Suzuki v. Greenberg (10-26-23) |
||
October 30, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #019) Letter to Justice Lebovits concerning Motion Sequences 18 and 19 |
||
September 10, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND for Expert Disclosure, Report of David Tennant re interpretation of Oct. Nov. and Dec. 2015 orders |
||
September 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA Second Amended Subpoena to AT&T |
||
September 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA Amended Subpoena to AT&T |
||
August 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA Subpoena to AT&T for Jan. 11, 2016 calls for 516-922-2545 and 516-776-2345 |
||
August 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #019) Unredacted Email Exchange dated November 22 and 23, 2020 (see NYSCEF No. 1232) |
||
August 25, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #019) Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (see NYSCEF No. 1230) |
||
August 24, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #021) NYSCEF 1234 refiled with notarized signature |
||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #021) Excerts from Eric Berry deposition (7-12-23) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.