Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association As Trustee For Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2007-7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Incorvaia, Christina Alicia, Jacobs, Kyle James, Jurek, Amber Augustine, Montero, Christhie Maria, Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, (total of 5) See All against Board Of Managers Of The Club At Turtle Bay, Brian H. Madden, East River Mortgage Corp., Elizabeth D. Madden, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Francis A. Kahn Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis A. Kahn Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: July 17, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
July 17, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 02, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 05, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #011) | ||
July 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #011) NOS for 11/30/2022 and appearance Details |
||
July 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #011) F- 5/31/22 and 6/9/22 emails from the court regarding sale |
||
July 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #011) E- court Detail showing prior orders |
||
July 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #011) 4/21/22 Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.