Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mary Ellen Albino, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Russo, Thomas Steven, against Brightview Enterprise Solutions, Llc F K A Brickman Facility Solutions, Llc, Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., Jpmorgan Chase & Co, Kimco Realty Corporation, represented by Ali, Faneeza, Brower, Gregory Eric, Feferman, Irina, Gross, Aaron C, Kalick, Lindsay J, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Conrad D Singer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConrad D Singer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: May 06, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: March 12, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 27, 2021STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 18, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: June 17, 2021SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: May 06, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION *Corrected*
Date: June 09, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: March 09, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 24, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 06, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 17, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 15, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 19, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 29, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 26, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 16, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 05, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 14, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 14, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 17, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 17, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 01, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Kimco Demand 9-28-22
Date: January 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Supp Demand JP Morgan 10-18-22
Date: January 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Brightview 10-5-22
Date: January 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Third Supp Demand for Authos 9-29-22
Date: January 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to JPMC Demand pf 9-21-22
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Post EBT Demand Russ Fragala 10-25-22
Date: January 04, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 14, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Letter to Defendant giving Stony Brook authos
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 28, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 27, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 16, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND JPMCs Letter Response to Plaintiffs March 10, 2023 Good Faith Letter |
||
March 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
March 10, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter to Defendant requesting responses |
||
March 01, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 28, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) So Ordered Stip dated August 2, 2022 |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #002) Plaintiffs EBT transcript Sep. 8, 2022 |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) KIMCO Answer and Various Demands |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Plaintiffs Supp bp and Response to JPMC 9.1.20 letter |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.