Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Local Union No 580 Of The International Association Of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental And Reinforcing Iron Workers, Afl-Cio,, Trustees Of Local Union No 580 Of The International Association Of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental And Reinforcing Iron Workers Employee Benefits Funds,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Keane, Thomas P., against Vica Industries, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Roy Mahon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoy Mahon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is filed by Local Union No. 580 of the International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, AFL-CIO, and the Trustees of Local Union No. 580 Employee Benefit Funds against VICA Industries, Inc. The...
JUDGMENT *Corrected*
Date: June 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment with Notice of Entry |
||
June 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT *Corrected* | ||
March 31, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
||
March 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Order with Notice of Entry |
||
March 29, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) | ||
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Roy S. Mahon Motion Part ADMIN (Conversion) Judge: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) ROY S. MAHON (MOTION PART) ADMIN Judge: ROY S. MAHON |
|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) ROY S. MAHON (MOTION PART) EFILE 12/9/2020 NOTICE MOTION## Judge: ROY S. MAHON |
|
December 22, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service from SOS for Vica Industries, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.