Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Geico, Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Griffin, Meghan Lynn, Rooney, Jessica Rose, Toor, Kirandeep Kaur, against Green Power New York Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Pineda-Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Judgment with Notice of Entry |
||
July 20, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001) | ||
June 07, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Notice of virtual conference to defaulting party, with proof of service |
||
May 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service CPLR |
||
March 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Word Certification |
||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Filed Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.