Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maria Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sanders, Brian Michael, against Jay Safar, Molly Amelia Safar, represented by Casale, Doreen E., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
November 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Change Venue |
||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants Answer |
||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint |
||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand to Change Venue |
||
November 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Defendant |
||
November 10, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.