Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Albert Weiss Air Conditioning Products, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steinberg, Rick Aaron, against Air Dynamics Corp., represented by Rothman, Jordan Ian, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Francis Ricigliano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis Ricigliano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 23, 2022SUMMONS
Date: September 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 23, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 31, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 31, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 01, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 28, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: October 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Order for Turnover of Possession |
||
January 19, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER TURN OVER |
||
November 28, 2022 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
November 15, 2022 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
November 07, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
November 01, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 31, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
October 31, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Picking Sheets / Packing Slips |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.