Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deborah Spruyt, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martello, Greg Patric, against Joaquim Goncalves, Maria Goncalves, represented by Dahlgren, Eric Gordon, Leventhal, Steven Gary, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine Rizzo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine Rizzo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 28, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
September 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 12, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
June 06, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance as to Excess Liability |
||
April 26, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 23, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 15, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 24, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
February 24, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.