Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Randolph Galler, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Levine, Andrew J, November, Steven C., against Debenedittis Masonary Designs Inc, El Jireh Renovation Llc, Gilman Management Corporation, Nassau Windsor Co., represented by Christie, David Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management375 days |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip &Amp; Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
ANSWER
Date: October 22, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exh D - Third party Answer |
||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Exh G - Note of Issue |
||
May 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of service |
||
May 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Affirmation In Support |
||
May 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exh A - S&C |
||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exh E - Plft Verified BP |
||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exh C - Third party summons |
||
May 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exh B - Gilman's Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.