Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Avanza Group, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Ballard Investments Inc. D B A Ballard Investments Inc., Investment Management Group, Llc, D B A Investment Management Group, Llc, Ralph Lewis Ballard Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 27, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #1) Transcript
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 28, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Merchant Agreement Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Merchant Agreement Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | ||
July 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 07, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) MOT SEQ #01 |
||
February 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Appellate Decision |
||
February 17, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Adler |
||
January 28, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Decision |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Bank Statements |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.