Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joy Marie Scotti, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Munawar, Adnan, Yilmaz, Kenan Mark, against Amy F. Sheehan, James V. Sheehan, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas Rademaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Rademaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 24, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 15, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 15, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 22, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 17, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: August 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer |
||
July 18, 2023 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #001) Certificate of Compliance |
||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Narrative Report |
||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Plaintiff Transcript |
||
July 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) VBOP |
||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Dr. Harhash Report |
||
July 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Attorney Certification |
||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) MRI |
||
July 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Chiropractor Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.