Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jamal J. Lewis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hazelton, Donald H., Torto, Thomas, against Melanie A. Greene, Trevor C. Greene, represented by Gould, David S, Hynes, Trishe' L.A., Oliff, Jillian Fallon, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 22, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
March 17, 2023 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
March 17, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
February 28, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 23, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
February 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.