Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Merchant Advance, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fogel, David, against Donnell Leclover W Akins, Dougpor Enterprises, Llc, Loria A. Harville-Akins, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Pineda-Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 03, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on all defs via email |
||
September 08, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed OSC |
||
September 03, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 03, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
September 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Payment History |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.