Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nugent Marine, Llc, Patrick Nugent Derivatively O B O Paul Nugent & Sons Marine Construction Corp., Patrick Nugent Individually, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cecere, Frank A, Horowitz, Daniel Joshua, Mauro, Susan, against Paul Nugent Iii, Reliant Custom Marine, Llc, represented by Brandt, James Edward, Gomberg, Trevor Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Driscoll Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #011) Seq# 11 & 12 |
||
August 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
August 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF REJECTION | ||
August 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM- DEFENDANT PATRICK NUGENT | ||
August 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFEDANT NUGENT MARINE, LLC | ||
August 24, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION OF PATRICK NUGENT, NAMED AS SUING DERIVATIVELY HEREIN ON NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION OF PATRICK NUGENT, NAMED AS SUING DERIVATIVELY HEREIN ON ... show more |
||
August 22, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 17, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Response to Defendants' Letter Dated 8.16.23 |
||
August 16, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Justice Timothy S. Driscoll, J.S.C. regarding Party Discovery. |
||
August 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXH A to August 16, 2023 Correspondence to Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.