Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Monroy, Alejandro, against Stephanie Harris, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Roy Mahon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoy Mahon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 06, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Roy S. Mahon PER LETTER (Conversion) Judge: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Roy S. Mahon Motion Part PER MOVANT LETTER, CASE SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) ROY S. MAHON (MOTION PART) EFILE 10/2/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: ROY S. MAHON |
|
January 13, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Roy S. Mahon Motion Part EFILE 10/2/2020, NOTICE MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. |
|
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) ROY S. MAHON (MOTION PART) EFILE 10/2/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: ROY S. MAHON |
|
November 11, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 06, 2020 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
October 02, 2020 | Motion |
Compel Arbitration (Motion #001) Decided: 01/15/2021Withdrawn Before Justice: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Mahon, Hon. Roy S. |
|
October 02, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.