Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Russell Friedman Law Group, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Filosa, Steven Robert, Shapiro, Spencer D., against A&E R.E. Management Corp., Ag Realty Bronx Corp., Arihay Kaikov, Ny Prime Holding Llc, Pacific 2340 Corp., (total of 6) See All represented by Bowman, Dustin B., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher G Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 06, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Demands |
||
October 13, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Interrogatories |
||
October 13, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Discovery Demands |
||
September 05, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition for The Russel Friedman Law Group |
||
September 05, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Demands for The Russel Friedman Law Group |
||
August 16, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 14, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 15, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 11, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
May 11, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.