Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Point 62 Llc, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Finley, Glenn, against Gelt Llc, Jane Does, John Does, Midfirst Bank, Nassau County Educators Federal Credit Union, (total of 8) See All represented by Sorid, Harvey, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 28, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 11, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 03, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 03, 2022STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 23, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 23, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER TAX LIEN FORECLOSURE RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY PART ORDER |
||
February 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr settle cancel Conf |
||
January 30, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Lien |
||
October 03, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
October 03, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) SNC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.