Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Geico, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Weakland, Shawn Michael, against Chetanaben Patel, represented by Schwartzapfel, Steven J., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Jeffrey Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 06, 2020PETITION *Corrected*
Date: July 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Notice of Appeal/Informational Statement/Copy of Order/Proof of Service |
||
November 02, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 02, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 08, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) JEFFREY S. BROWN (MOTION PT) EFILE 7/24/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
October 06, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply affirmation |
||
October 01, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proof of Certified Mail Delivery |
||
October 01, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 01, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Respondent's Specials Package w/ Demand for Arbitration Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Respondent's Specials Package w/ Demand for Arbitration Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.