Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Repwest Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Biggie, Brian, against Allbahadur Itwaru, Ean Holdings Llc, Infinity Insurance Co., Katonya Freeman, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, (total of 8) See All represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine Rizzo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine Rizzo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 28, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge |
||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 27, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Proposed Order |
||
January 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Exhibit H - Affidavits of Service of S&C |
||
January 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
January 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Motion |
||
January 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I - Affidavit of Service of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.