Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hasupha Bryant, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Sanders, Alan M, Sanders, Brian Michael, against Festival Fun Parks, Llc D B A Splish Splash, represented by Matar, Stephanie S., Schianodicola, Jaclyn Marie, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Thomas Feinman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Feinman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management208 days |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time845 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 19, 2016 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL DCM TRIAL PART TF0922 Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
September 06, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART TF0922 Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
July 28, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART TF0922 Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) THOMAS FEINMAN (MOTION PT) EFILED MOTION,2PGS 4/25/16 TO TF Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002) | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.