Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Englander, Michelle C, Kuncman, Karen L., Poncet, Jessica Hope, against Christian Bezmalinovic, Iconic Mechanical, Llc, represented by Kutil, Peter Mario, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Angela G. Iannacci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAngela G. Iannacci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time510 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2014ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: June 09, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2016 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL DCM PRETRIAL PART AGI0416 Judge: ANGELA G. IANNACCI |
|
August 20, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order |
||
August 20, 2015 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
June 09, 2015 |
ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT Signed 6/4/2015 |
||
June 04, 2015 | Hearing |
CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE HELD ANGELA G. IANNACCI(CERC) Judge: ANGELA G. IANNACCI |
|
May 20, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED ANGELA G. IANNACCI(CERC) Judge: ANGELA G. IANNACCI |
|
April 09, 2015 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD ANGELA G. IANNACCI (COMC) Judge: ANGELA G. IANNACCI |
|
January 05, 2015 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Signed 12/17/2014 |
||
December 17, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD ANGELA G. IANNACCI (PC PART) Judge: ANGELA G. IANNACCI |
|
November 03, 2014 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.