Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michael Messina, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dell, Joseph Gerard, Viener, Joseph B, against Morton Village Realty Inc., Phillips International Realty Inc., represented by Andreou, Michael E., Berne, Richard William, Cox, Ariel S., Johnson, Candace Renee, Lewis, Darnisha Alon, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Erica L Prager presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErica L Prager Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1719 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 11, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: June 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Motion Seq 010, 011 and 012 |
||
May 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 11, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010) MOT. SEQ. 10, 11 and 12 |
||
March 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #010) Affirmation in Reply in Support of Motion for Post-Trial Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to CPL Affirmation in Reply in Support of Motion for Post-Trial Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to CPL ... show more |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #011) Copy of Court's Decision |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #012) Proposed Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
March 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #012) Affirmation in Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Cross Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complai Affirmation in Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Cross Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complai ... show more |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #012) Judge Prager's Rules |
||
March 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 26, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.