Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against Brian A Doherty, Kathleen E Doherty, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Norman Janowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman Janowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions225 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time282 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: March 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 12, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT & ORDER IN FORFEITURE |
|
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) NORMAN JANOWITZ (MOTION) EFILED MOTION,2PGS 3/16/15 TO CMP Judge: NORMAN JANOWITZ |
|
March 16, 2015 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 05/05/2015MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: NORMAN JANOWITZ Answer demanded: Yes Judge: NORMAN JANOWITZ |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #001) affidavit of service - kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.