Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against American Honda Finance Corporation, Laura J Flynn, Thomas E Flynn, represented by Meola, Rudolph J, Milner, Martin Lee, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Norman Janowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman Janowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 19, 2014STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 12, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2015 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) honda |
||
January 12, 2015 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
December 08, 2014 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) CALENDAR CLERK DEPT STIP/DISC 12/4/14 Judge: NORMAN JANOWITZ |
|
December 04, 2014 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) thomas & Laura |
||
December 04, 2014 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Answer with Cross-Claim on Laura Flynn |
||
September 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Answer with Cross-Claim on Thomas Flynn |
||
August 28, 2014 | REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) | ||
August 19, 2014 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
August 15, 2014 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.