Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Helene Korbin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Halpern, Philip M, Hochberg, Shari B., Nicolay, Harry Joseph, against Newell Laird, represented by Laird, Sonia, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Jerome C Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJerome C Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 01, 2015ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)
Date: April 27, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 19, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected*
Date: May 22, 2015STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: April 03, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: April 03, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2015 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE JEROME C. MURPHY Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
May 22, 2015 | Hearing |
WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) JEROME C. MURPHY Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected* | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) JEROME C. MURPHY Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Release |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Release |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Order and Stipulation of Settlement to be "So-Ordered" |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Cover Letter to Court Requesting "So-Ordering" of Stipulation of Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.