Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Japex Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ginsburg, Hal Richard, Misk, Gerard N, against Both A K A And D B A Reflection Sports, Individually And D B A Reflection Sports, Jim Geraghty, Meridian Sports, Inc., Mountain Reflection Corp., (total of 5) See All represented by Katz, Joshua Reuven, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Thomas A Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas A Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2012 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: July 06, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 17, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2012ANSWER
Date: July 06, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2013NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: May 10, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2012JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: July 06, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Short form order in reference to motion sequence numbers 2 & 3, entered by the C.C. on April 17, 201 |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition to Cross-Motion and in Support of Motion |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Exhibit F |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exhibit E |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exhibit D |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.