Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
91 Pine Hollow Properties Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Litt, Robert Gordon, against The Board Of Assessors And Or The Assessor Of The County Of Nassau And The Nassau County Assessment Review Commission, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Tax presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Tax Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 30, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 30, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 30, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: November 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order & Judgement |
||
March 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Schedule A |
||
December 30, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order with Stipulation of Settlement |
||
December 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Settlement |
||
November 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 10, 2021 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
November 10, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.