Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust Mortgage Loan Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-14, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Light, Danielle Paula, Malekan, Mojdeh, against Chase Bank, Usa, Na, Ge Money Bank, Hirsch & Hirsch Llp, James Hajny, Josephine Virgillo A K A Josephine Virgilio, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 03, 2021REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 17, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 22, 2022REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 04, 2022REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
February 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) Suggestion of Bankruptcy |
||
February 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
February 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
January 05, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 23, 2022 | REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 17, 2022 | REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.