Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For The Cmlti Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-Amc3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Devika Russell, Emerging Business Group, Inc, John Smith, Lvnv Funding, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 29, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
September 23, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 10, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
May 17, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER change of publication |
||
April 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
February 15, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* RNOS PART ORDER |
||
January 26, 2022 | REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE | ||
September 02, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
September 02, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.