Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Lloyd M Lapidow, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Roy Mahon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoy Mahon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Other) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 24, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 02, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 02, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
September 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Statute of Limitations Affidavit |
||
September 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status |
||
September 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 24, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 01, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) MILITARY STATUS |
||
November 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #001) Default letter & Affidavit |
||
November 13, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) affidavit of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.