Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Franklin Matute, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Manolakis, Michael Nikolas, against Anray Custom Builders Incorporated, Jm Construction Company Of L.I., Llc, Town Of Hempstead, represented by Camhi, Stanley A, O'Brien, Kevin J., Vatter, Christopher E, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 23, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 30, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: April 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 01, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
March 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Defendant Town of Hempstead's Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Order and Proof of Defendant Town of Hempstead's Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, Copy of Order and Proof of ... show more |
||
March 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 10, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 19, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
September 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #008) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint |
||
September 19, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
September 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #008) Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Town of Hempstead's Motion For Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.