Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Alpin Haus Ski Shop, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Culnan, Brian Mark, against Brp Us Inc., represented by Smith, Owen H., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Violations) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Removal |
||
February 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) | ||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of OSC etc. in compliance with BCL 307 |
||
February 02, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Proof of Registered Mail |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS of Summons etc. in compliance with BCL 307 |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* AOS of OSC etc. in compliance with BCL 307 |
||
January 30, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 30, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
January 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation |
||
January 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.