Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Ronald Wilmot Jr, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
April 01, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted per 22 NYCRR CHANGE OF ADDRESS Redacted |
||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.