Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Sally Fletcher, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 16, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: November 05, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 16, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1406807 |
||
December 16, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1406807 | ||
November 05, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1406807 |
||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1406807 |
||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1406807 |
||
September 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.