Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Bonnie Martin, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 30, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 03, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
September 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.