Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Kristine D., Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Heather Clouser, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 16, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 17, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 12, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
||
November 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 11, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #01) EXHIBIT 5- AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.