Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Garry M Peruzzi, represented by Rodier, Ian Howard, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
ANSWER
Date: August 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 16, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 30, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: September 24, 2021DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) Statements
Date: June 16, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 10, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 30, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
May 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Non Military Affirmation |
||
May 10, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
November 01, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
November 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Non Military Affirmation |
||
October 05, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
June 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Answer |
||
June 16, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.