Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra) case represented by Brousseau, Shawn Frederick, against American General Annuity Service Corporation, Nicholas Erkson, United States Life Insurance Company In The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra) |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
|
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS of Proposed Order |
||
August 20, 2021 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO OSC (AFTER SERVICE) (Motion #1) Corrected disclosure |
||
August 19, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order approved by carriers |
||
August 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS of Teams Hearing |
||
July 28, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
July 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex B to petition contract and disclosure Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex B to petition contract and disclosure Redacted |
||
July 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ex. B to Payee Affidavit |
||
July 20, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) Proposed OTSC |
||
July 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Payee Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.