Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against John J Keba, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
July 12, 2023 | Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
December 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
December 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#424297 |
||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Orig Cred |
||
December 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 13, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.