Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Church Of The Good Shepherd, filed a(n) Other Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property case represented by Brown, Mary Susan, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Rebecca A Slezak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca A Slezak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Sale Or Finance Of Religious/Not For Profit Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
|
PETITION
Date: June 16, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 16, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 20, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) | ||
July 19, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Attorney General Consent not required |
||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H-1 Special Business Meeting Minutes & Resolution |
||
June 23, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 16, 2021 | PETITION | ||
June 16, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 16, 2021 |
RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Sale of Religious Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.