Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against John Doe, Urszula Dziuba, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Hon. Felix J Catena presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHon. Felix J Catena Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - - Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 12, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #02) Supporting Documents |
||
September 22, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #02) Filed by AXS 102769 |
||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #02) affidavit of mailing (certificate of service) |
||
September 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 22, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 21, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 21, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.