Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against John Doe, Magdelena Mendoza, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation D B A National Grid, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, NY, . Montgomery County, NY Superior Courts with Hon. Felix J Catena presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHon. Felix J Catena Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 02, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE |
||
January 02, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF INVESTIGATOR NON-MILITARY STATUS |
||
January 02, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
November 01, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
May 21, 2019 | ANSWER | ||
March 15, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
March 15, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI |
||
August 23, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
August 23, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY (7) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.