Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Patricia Bruckel, Robert Siracusa, Sally Hirth, Thomas Bruckel, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Knauf, Alan Jon, Tantillo, Jonathan Ross, against Carl Myers Enterprises Inc, Conesus Town Of, Planning Board Of The Town Of Conesus, represented by Mancuso, John Ahmed, Robinson, Terence L, Zoghlin, Mindy Lee, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 26, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 21, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 31, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 20, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
December 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 14, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 14, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Hooker Affd 6.1.22 |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D1 (Motion #5) Mancuso Affm 6.1.22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.